E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR58
|
Journal Page: 5743
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 58
|
Journal Page: 3459
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3451
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3451
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2981
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1185
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4351
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Dukes
|
Journal Page: 4352
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4351
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2166
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1047
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 422
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 422
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|