E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6458
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6416
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6415
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4491
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5969
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5969
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3792
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3368
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5069
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1349
|
Journal Page: 5068
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5068
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5068
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5008
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1341
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Brown
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Brown
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Brown
|
Journal Page: 5005
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5005
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3636
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Deuell
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1232
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|