Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB773 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 773
 (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2011; March 1, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 4, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 4, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 773 By:  Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to telecommunications service discounts for educational
 institutions, libraries, hospitals, and telemedicine centers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 58.252, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Health center" means a federally qualified
 health center service delivery site.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (b), Section 58.255, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  An electing company shall offer private network service
 contracts under this subchapter at 110 [105] percent of the long run
 incremental cost of providing the private network service,
 including installation.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 58.258, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding the pricing flexibility authorized by
 this subtitle, an electing company's rates for private network
 services may not be increased before January 1, 2016 [2012].
 However, an electing company may increase a rate in accordance with
 the provisions of a customer specific contract.
 SECTION 4.  Subsection (b), Section 58.259, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The tariff rate may not be:
 (1)  distance sensitive; or
 (2)  higher than 110 [105] percent of the service's
 statewide average long run incremental cost, including
 installation.
 SECTION 5.  Subsection (c), Section 58.260, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The rate for the service may not be higher than 110 [105]
 percent of the service's long run incremental cost, including
 installation.
 SECTION 6.  Subsection (b), Section 58.261, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The rate for the service may not be higher than 110 [105]
 percent of the service's long run incremental cost, including
 installation.
 SECTION 7.  Section 58.268, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 58.268.  CONTINUATION OF OBLIGATION. Notwithstanding
 any other provision of this title, an electing company shall
 continue to comply with this subchapter until January 1, 2016
 [2012], regardless of:
 (1)  the date the company elected under this chapter;
 or
 (2)  any action taken in relation to that company under
 Chapter 65.
 SECTION 8.  Subsection (a), Section 59.077, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding the pricing flexibility authorized by
 this subtitle, an electing company's rates for private network
 services may not be increased before January 1, 2016 [2012].
 SECTION 9.  Section 59.083, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 59.083.  CONTINUATION OF OBLIGATION. Notwithstanding
 any other provision of this title, an electing company shall
 continue to comply with this subchapter until January 1, 2016
 [2012], regardless of:
 (1)  the date the company elected under this chapter;
 or
 (2)  any action taken in relation to that company under
 Chapter 65.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *