E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/21/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 771
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 451
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 451
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|