E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5762
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3678
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3369
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1355
|
Journal Page: 5074
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5074
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Hartnett
|
Journal Page: 5073
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5073
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5014
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
1-D. Miller, T. King, and Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 5014
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5013
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3636
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 611
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 611
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 611
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 611
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 610
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 610
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 610
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 610
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 610
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 610
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 451
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 451
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|