E
|
05/12/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/12/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
E
|
05/03/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2793
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1651
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
House adopts resolution recalling from Gov.
|
SCR 48
|
Journal Page: 2249
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution recalling from Gov.
|
SCR 48
|
Journal Page: 1606
|
E
|
04/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1281
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1170
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#375
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB909
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 452
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 452
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|