1 | 1 | | By: Nelson S.B. No. 797 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2011; March 1, 2011, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human |
---|
4 | 4 | | Services; April 4, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
6 | 6 | | April 4, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 797 By: Nelson |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to objective assessment processes for and appropriate |
---|
13 | 13 | | provision of acute nursing services and certain other services |
---|
14 | 14 | | provided under the Medicaid program. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
17 | 17 | | amended by adding Sections 531.02417, 531.024171, and 531.024172 to |
---|
18 | 18 | | read as follows: |
---|
19 | 19 | | Sec. 531.02417. MEDICAID NURSING SERVICES ASSESSMENTS. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (a) In this section, "acute nursing services" means home health |
---|
21 | 21 | | skilled nursing services, home health aide services, and private |
---|
22 | 22 | | duty nursing services. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) The commission shall develop an objective assessment |
---|
24 | 24 | | process for use in assessing the needs of a Medicaid recipient for |
---|
25 | 25 | | acute nursing services. The commission shall require that: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (1) the assessment be conducted: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (A) by a state employee or contractor who is not |
---|
28 | 28 | | the person who will deliver any necessary services to the recipient |
---|
29 | 29 | | and is not affiliated with the person who will deliver those |
---|
30 | 30 | | services; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (B) in a timely manner so as to protect the health |
---|
32 | 32 | | and safety of the recipient by avoiding unnecessary delays in |
---|
33 | 33 | | service delivery; and |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) the process include: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (A) an assessment of specified criteria and |
---|
36 | 36 | | documentation of the assessment results on a standard form; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (B) an assessment of whether the recipient should |
---|
38 | 38 | | be referred for additional assessments regarding the recipient's |
---|
39 | 39 | | needs for therapy services, as defined by Section 531.024171, |
---|
40 | 40 | | attendant care services, and durable medical equipment; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (C) completion by the person conducting the |
---|
42 | 42 | | assessment of any documents related to obtaining prior |
---|
43 | 43 | | authorization for necessary nursing services. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (c) The commission shall: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (1) implement the objective assessment process |
---|
46 | 46 | | developed under Subsection (b) within the Medicaid fee-for-service |
---|
47 | 47 | | model and the primary care case management Medicaid managed care |
---|
48 | 48 | | model; and |
---|
49 | 49 | | (2) take necessary actions, including modifying |
---|
50 | 50 | | contracts with managed care organizations under Chapter 533 to the |
---|
51 | 51 | | extent allowed by law, to implement the process within the STAR and |
---|
52 | 52 | | STAR+PLUS Medicaid managed care programs. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (d) The executive commissioner shall adopt rules providing |
---|
54 | 54 | | for a process by which a provider of acute nursing services who |
---|
55 | 55 | | disagrees with the results of the assessment conducted as provided |
---|
56 | 56 | | by Subsection (b) may request and obtain a review of those results. |
---|
57 | 57 | | Sec. 531.024171. THERAPY SERVICES ASSESSMENTS. (a) In |
---|
58 | 58 | | this section, "therapy services" includes occupational, physical, |
---|
59 | 59 | | and speech therapy services. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (b) After implementing the objective assessment process for |
---|
61 | 61 | | acute nursing services as required by Section 531.02417, the |
---|
62 | 62 | | commission shall consider whether implementing an objective |
---|
63 | 63 | | assessment process for assessing the needs of a Medicaid recipient |
---|
64 | 64 | | for therapy services that is comparable to the process required |
---|
65 | 65 | | under Section 531.02417 for acute nursing services would be |
---|
66 | 66 | | feasible and beneficial. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (c) If the commission determines that implementing a |
---|
68 | 68 | | comparable process with respect to one or more types of therapy |
---|
69 | 69 | | services is feasible and would be beneficial, the commission may |
---|
70 | 70 | | implement the process within: |
---|
71 | 71 | | (1) the Medicaid fee-for-service model; |
---|
72 | 72 | | (2) the primary care case management Medicaid managed |
---|
73 | 73 | | care model; and |
---|
74 | 74 | | (3) the STAR and STAR+PLUS Medicaid managed care |
---|
75 | 75 | | programs. |
---|
76 | 76 | | (d) An objective assessment process implemented under this |
---|
77 | 77 | | section must include a process that allows a provider of therapy |
---|
78 | 78 | | services to request and obtain a review of the results of an |
---|
79 | 79 | | assessment conducted as provided by this section that is comparable |
---|
80 | 80 | | to the process implemented under rules adopted under Section |
---|
81 | 81 | | 531.02417(d). |
---|
82 | 82 | | Sec. 531.024172. ELECTRONIC VISIT VERIFICATION SYSTEM. |
---|
83 | 83 | | (a) In this section, "acute nursing services" has the meaning |
---|
84 | 84 | | assigned by Section 531.02417. |
---|
85 | 85 | | (b) If it is cost-effective and feasible, the commission |
---|
86 | 86 | | shall implement an Electronic Visit Verification system to |
---|
87 | 87 | | electronically verify and document through a telephone or |
---|
88 | 88 | | computer-based system basic information relating to the delivery of |
---|
89 | 89 | | Medicaid acute nursing services, including: |
---|
90 | 90 | | (1) the provider's name; |
---|
91 | 91 | | (2) the recipient's name; and |
---|
92 | 92 | | (3) the date and time the provider begins and ends each |
---|
93 | 93 | | service delivery visit. |
---|
94 | 94 | | SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2012, the Health and |
---|
95 | 95 | | Human Services Commission shall implement the Electronic Visit |
---|
96 | 96 | | Verification system required by Section 531.024172, Government |
---|
97 | 97 | | Code, as added by this Act, if the commission determines that |
---|
98 | 98 | | implementation of that system is cost-effective and feasible. |
---|
99 | 99 | | SECTION 3. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
100 | 100 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
101 | 101 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
102 | 102 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
103 | 103 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
104 | 104 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
105 | 105 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
106 | 106 | | * * * * * |
---|