E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/21/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4613
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4231
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1165
|
Journal Page: 4230
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4230
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4230
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4145
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4145
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 453
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 453
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|