E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6278
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4106
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4106
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4106
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4105
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3701
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1430
|
Journal Page: 5451
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5451
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5451
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5289
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Giddings
|
Journal Page: 5288
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5288
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 941
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 630
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 630
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 630
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 630
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 538
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 454
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 454
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|