E
|
06/17/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6455
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4546
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4546
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4546
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4542
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5444
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1423
|
Journal Page: 5444
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5444
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 5444
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5264
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5264
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
2-Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 5264
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
4-S. Miller
|
Journal Page: 5264
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 5262
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 5261
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5261
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 211
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 211
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|