House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1128
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 974
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 455
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 455
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|