House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1272
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1272
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1272
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1272
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|