Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3575
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1405
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5409
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5409
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2718
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2655
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1162
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 457
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 457
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|