E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/30/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5150 | |
House | 05/29/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6869 | |
Senate | 05/29/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5042 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5039 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 6276 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 4047 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 4047 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 4047 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 4047 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 3334 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Record vote | RV#1306 | Journal Page: 4857 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 4857 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Amended | 3-Chisum | Journal Page: 4857 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4856 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Postponed | 5/23/11 4:30 PM | Journal Page: 4815 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | 2-Hughes | Journal Page: 4815 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 4815 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-Hughes and Phillips | Journal Page: 4814 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4813 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4720 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4720 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 458 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 458 | |
Senate | 02/22/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |