E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3056
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3320
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1185
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1217
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1217
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1217
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1217
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 458
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 458
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|