E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/26/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4034 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5957 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3772 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 5046 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3268 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 3268 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 3268 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3267 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2689 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Record vote | RV#1190 | Journal Page: 4373 |
House | 05/20/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4373 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4373 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 4311 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Amended | 1-Gutierrez | Journal Page: 4310 |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4310 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1115 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 808 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 459 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 459 | |
Senate | 02/22/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |