House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 878 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 878 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 878 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 877 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hegar | Journal Page: 876 |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 459 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 459 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |