|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4581
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6380
|
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5454
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1432
|
Journal Page: 5453
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
6-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 5453
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Article III, Section 35
|
Journal Page: 5451
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5451
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/25/11 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 5425
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5424
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5173
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1367
|
Journal Page: 5173
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5173
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 5172
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 5171
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5171
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3829
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 898
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 898
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 898
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 898
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 898
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 898
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 886
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 886
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|