Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB875 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 875


 AN ACT
 relating to compliance with state and federal environmental permits
 as a defense to certain actions for nuisance or trespass.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 7, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 7.257 to read as follows:
 Sec. 7.257.  DEFENSE TO NUISANCE OR TRESPASS.  (a)  A
 person, as defined by Section 382.003, Health and Safety Code, who
 is subject to an administrative, civil, or criminal action brought
 under this chapter for nuisance or trespass arising from greenhouse
 gas emissions has an affirmative defense to that action if the
 person's actions that resulted in the alleged nuisance or trespass
 were authorized by a rule, permit, order, license, certificate,
 registration, approval, or other form of authorization issued by
 the commission or the federal government or an agency of the federal
 government and:
 (1)  the person was in substantial compliance with that
 rule, permit, order, license, certificate, registration, approval,
 or other authorization while the alleged nuisance or trespass was
 occurring; or
 (2)  the commission or the federal government or an
 agency of the federal government exercised enforcement discretion
 in connection with the actions that resulted in the alleged
 nuisance or trespass.
 (b)  This section does not apply to nuisance actions solely
 based on a noxious odor.
 SECTION 2.  Section 7.257, Water Code, as added by this Act,
 applies only to an administrative enforcement action, a civil
 action, or a prosecution that is commenced on or after the effective
 date of this Act.  An administrative enforcement action, a civil
 action, or a prosecution commenced before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the action or
 prosecution commenced, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 875 passed the Senate on
 April 4, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 23, Nays 8;
 May 26, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 23,
 Nays 8.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 875 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 78,
 Nays 65, one present not voting; May 27, 2011, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 135, Nays 7, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor