E
|
05/19/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2613
|
E
|
05/09/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2084
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2944
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 2944
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2944
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2944
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2937
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2937
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB3077
|
Journal Page: 2937
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2718
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1314
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1314
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1314
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Nichols
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|