House | 05/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2386 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1134 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 460 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 460 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |