E
|
05/21/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
E
|
05/11/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2156
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3223
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#858
|
Journal Page: 3222
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3222
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3222
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3191
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3191
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 922
|
Journal Page: 3191
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 461
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 461
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|