E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6610
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1709
|
Journal Page: 6610
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6609
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6872
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5049
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5854
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5854
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4802
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1264
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4770
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4772
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 4772
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4772
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4337
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1268
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1268
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1268
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1268
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1267
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1267
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1267
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1232
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 614
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 211
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 211
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|