Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB89 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 89


 AN ACT
 relating to summer nutrition programs provided for by school
 districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.0029 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.0029.  SUMMER NUTRITION PROGRAMS. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Field office" means a field office of a nutrition
 program administered by the department.
 (2)  "Summer nutrition program" means the summer food
 service program under 42 U.S.C. Section 1761. The term includes the
 seamless summer option under 42 U.S.C. Section 1761(a)(8).
 (b)  Unless the department grants a school district a waiver
 under Subsection (f), a district in which 50 percent or more of the
 students are eligible to participate in the national free or
 reduced-price lunch program under 42 U.S.C. Section 1751 et seq.
 shall provide or arrange for the provision of a summer nutrition
 program for at least 30 days during the period in which district
 schools are recessed for the summer.
 (c)  Not later than October 31 of each year, the department
 shall notify each school district described by Subsection (b) of
 the district's responsibility concerning provision of a summer
 nutrition program during the next period in which school is
 recessed for the summer.
 (d)  Not later than November 30 of each year, the board of
 trustees of a school district that intends to request a waiver under
 Subsection (e)(2) must send written notice of the district's
 intention to the district's local school health advisory council.
 The notice must include an explanation of the district's reason for
 requesting a waiver of the requirement.
 (e)  Each school district that receives a notice under
 Subsection (c) shall, not later than January 31 of the year
 following the year in which the notice was received:
 (1)  inform the department in writing that the district
 intends to provide or arrange for the provision of a summer
 nutrition program during the next period in which district schools
 are recessed for the summer; or
 (2)  request in writing that the department grant the
 district a waiver of the requirement to provide or arrange for the
 provision of a summer nutrition program.
 (f)  The department may grant a school district a waiver of
 the requirement to provide or arrange for the provision of a summer
 nutrition program only if:
 (1)  the district:
 (A)  provides documentation, verified by the
 department, showing that:
 (i)  there are fewer than 100 children in the
 district currently eligible for the national free or reduced-price
 lunch program;
 (ii)  transportation to enable district
 students to participate in the program is an insurmountable
 obstacle to the district's ability to provide or arrange for the
 provision of the program despite consultation by the district with
 public transit providers;
 (iii)  the district is unable to provide or
 arrange for the provision of a program due to renovation or
 construction of district facilities and the unavailability of an
 appropriate alternate provider or site; or
 (iv)  the district is unable to provide or
 arrange for the provision of a program due to another specified
 extenuating circumstance and the unavailability of an appropriate
 alternate provider or site; and
 (B)  has worked with the field offices to identify
 another possible provider for the program in the district; or
 (2)  the cost to the district to provide or arrange for
 provision of a program would be cost-prohibitive, as determined by
 the department using the criteria and methodology established under
 Subsection (g).
 (g)  The department by rule shall establish criteria and a
 methodology for determining whether the cost to a school district
 to provide or arrange for provision of a summer nutrition program
 would be cost-prohibitive for purposes of granting a waiver under
 Subsection (f)(2).
 (h)  A waiver granted under Subsection (f) is for a one-year
 period.
 (i)  If a school district has requested a waiver under
 Subsection (e)(2) and has been unable to provide to the department a
 list of possible providers for the summer nutrition program, the
 field offices shall continue to attempt to identify an alternate
 provider for the district's summer nutrition program.
 (j)  Not later than December 31 of each even-numbered year,
 the department shall provide to the legislature by e-mail a report
 that, for each year of the biennium:
 (1)  states the name of each school district that
 receives a notice under Subsection (c) and indicates whether the
 district:
 (A)  has provided or arranged for the provision of
 a summer nutrition program; or
 (B)  has not provided or arranged for the
 provision of a program and did not receive a waiver;
 (2)  identifies the funds, other than federal funds,
 used by school districts and the state in complying with this
 section; and
 (3)  identifies the total amount of any profit made or
 loss incurred through summer nutrition programs under this section.
 (k)  The department shall post and maintain on the
 department's Internet website the most recent report required by
 Subsection (j).
 SECTION 2.  Section 33.024, Human Resources Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than October 1, 2011, the Department of
 Agriculture shall adopt rules under Subsection (g), Section
 12.0029, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act, establishing
 criteria and a methodology regarding costs of school district
 summer nutrition programs.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 89 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 24, Nays 7;
 May 25, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 24,
 Nays 7.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 89 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 26, 2011, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 121, Nays 25, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor