House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1036 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1036 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1036 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 495 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 495 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |