|
05/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3299
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2078
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2078
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2078
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2077
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2077
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2077
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 495
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 495
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|