House | 05/22/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5047 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3237 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1544 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |