Senate | 04/14/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 592 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 592 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |