House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4618 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |