House | 05/18/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2257 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2257 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |