Senate | 04/14/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1132 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 497 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 497 | |
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |