Senate | 05/06/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1645 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 497 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 497 | |
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |