E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6280
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4209
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4208
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4208
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3201
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1134
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|