House | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 3296 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3296 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3090 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2065 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1895 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1895 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1895 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1895 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1895 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1895 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1895 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Seliger | Journal Page: 1894 |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1894 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1894 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 499 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 499 | |
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |