House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6457
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4470
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5854
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5854
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3463
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3335
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4838
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1288
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4736
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4736
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
5-V. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 4735
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4731
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3652
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2166
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
Senate
|
02/25/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|