Senate | 04/18/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |