E
|
05/28/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2515
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2489
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2489
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2489
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2489
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2156
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3224
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#859
|
Journal Page: 3223
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3223
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3223
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#842
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Murphy
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1316
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2166
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
Senate
|
02/25/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|