|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4133
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1426
|
Journal Page: 5446
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5446
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5446
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1385
|
Journal Page: 5270
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 5270
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5269
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/24/11 7:20 PM
|
Journal Page: 5259
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5258
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
Senate
|
02/25/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|