|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/21/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4209
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3201
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 836
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 642
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 586
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
Senate
|
01/28/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|