E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1185
|
Journal Page: 4367
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 4367
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4360
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 586
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|