Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR12

Introduced
2/2/11  
Introduced
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 2, 2011, and ending on Monday, February 7, 2011.

Impact

If approved, SCR12 would modify the usual practices concerning the legislative schedule. This would grant flexibility to manage legislative duties effectively over the proposed dates. The resolution reflects the legislature's operational needs, especially in contexts where extended time away from session may be necessary, whether for strategic planning, public engagement, or dealing with pressing issues requiring focused attention outside the formal session structure.

Summary

SCR12, a Senate Concurrent Resolution introduced during the 82nd Texas Legislature, seeks permission from each house of the legislature to adjourn for a period longer than the standard three days. Specifically, it requests this special permission for the duration between February 2, 2011, and February 7, 2011. This resolution is grounded in the stipulation laid out in Section 17, Article III of the Texas Constitution, which traditionally restricts legislative adjournment without mutual consent from both houses of the legislature.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR12 appears to be neutral, focusing on procedural aspects rather than policy controversies. Given the nature of the resolution, discussions might not have been highly contentious since it deals with operational logistics rather than substantive legislative changes. Such procedural resolutions typically receive broad support when they promote the handling of legislative duties more effectively.

Contention

While no substantial points of contention were reported regarding SCR12, the request for extended adjournment could present logistical challenges or displeasure among those who prioritize continuity in legislative processes. However, without previous vocal opposition documented during the session, we can infer that, on the whole, SCR12 is likely viewed as a routine procedural formality necessary for the legislature’s operations.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.