E | 03/01/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 463 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 576 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 445 | |
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 02/28/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 429 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Record vote | RV#53 | Journal Page: 468 |
House | 02/23/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 468 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 468 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 442 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 348 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 348 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 348 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 348 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |