E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6276 | |
05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | |||
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4000 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4034 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3702 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5475 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | RV#1450 | Journal Page: 5474 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5474 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5474 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4125 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 11/10/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |