Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR27 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wentworth S.C.R. No. 27


 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Dr. Angel W. Lee alleges that:
 (1)  in September 2008, Dr. Lee entered an employment
 contract with The University of Texas Health Science Center at
 Houston for a full-time position of Associate Professor, tenure
 track, in the School of Health Information Sciences;
 (2)  under the terms of the contract, Dr. Lee was hired
 for the academic year 2009, a twelve month period;
 (3)  Dr. Lee completed her first year of academic
 service on August 31, 2009, and completed her second year of
 academic service on August 31, 2010;
 (4)  Dr. Lee began her third year of employment on
 September 1, 2010;
 (5)  on December 6, 2010, Dr. Lee received a Notice of
 Non-Reappointment from the university, which terminated Dr. Lee's
 employment effective August 31, 2011;
 (6)  Dr. Lee's termination was made pursuant to Policy
 44 of the Handbook of Operating Procedures of The University of
 Texas Health Science Center at Houston (HOOP); the HOOP, among
 other university policies and rules, was incorporated by reference
 into Dr. Lee's contract;
 (7)  under HOOP Policy 44, nontenured tenure-track
 faculty members in their third year of probationary service must
 receive notification of non-reappointment by August 31 of their
 third year in order to be terminated by August 31 of the following
 calendar year;
 (8)  Dr. Lee was given insufficient notice on December
 6, 2010, to terminate Dr. Lee's employment effective August 31,
 2011;
 (9)  proper notification of Dr. Lee's August 31, 2011,
 termination would have had to be given to Dr. Lee by August 31,
 2010;
 (10)  the university's actions constitute a breach of
 contract; and
 (11)  Dr. Lee will suffer irreparable harm, including
 loss of valuable research and the inability, as a practical matter,
 to secure new employment as a research scientist, unless the
 university is ordered by the courts to confirm Dr. Lee's
 appointment through August 31, 2012, under the terms of Dr. Lee's
 contract; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the Legislature of the State of Texas, That Dr.
 Angel W. Lee is granted permission to sue the State of Texas and The
 University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston subject to
 Chapter 107, Civil Practice and Remedies Code; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That Dr. Angel W. Lee may plead a cause of action
 for equitable relief, including specific performance of Dr. Lee's
 contract; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the president of The University of Texas
 Health Science Center at Houston and the attorney general be served
 process as provided by Section 107.002(a)(3), Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code.