E | 01/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 361 | |
E | 01/20/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 64 | |
House | 01/20/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 76 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 42 | |
House | 01/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 28 | |
House | 01/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#4 | Journal Page: 27 |
Senate | 01/12/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 27 | |
Senate | 01/12/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 22 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 27 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 27 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 30 | |
Senate | 01/11/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 19 | |
Senate | 01/11/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 19 | |
Senate | 01/11/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 19 | |
Senate | 01/11/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 19 | |
Senate | 01/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |