House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to State Sovereignty, Select | Journal Page: 3649 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3299 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2078 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2078 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2078 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2078 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2078 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 583 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 583 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |