E | 04/29/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1604 | |
E | 04/20/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1281 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2087 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1237 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1169 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1869 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1869 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1144 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 1144 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1144 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |