E | 05/09/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2195 | |
E | 04/28/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1428 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1372 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | RV#53 | Journal Page: 468 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2176 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2176 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1273 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1273 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 1273 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1273 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |