E | 05/27/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
E | 05/16/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4060 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2327 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3656 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3656 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2654 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |