E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/21/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4209
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 269
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 269
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 62
|
Senate
|
01/06/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|